Bartels, Ute Katharina (CPSO#: 78715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5249
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jul 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ute Katharina Bartels may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Bartels holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire  when  Dr.  Bartels  no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.