Bartens, Michelle Lee (CPSO#: 98096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton McMaster Family
Health Centre
Suite 103
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 1A0
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LEE BARTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2016