Bartlett, Eric Steven (CPSO#: 79820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Oklahoma, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3-956
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 6320
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jan 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Eric Steven Bartlett may practise medicine independently in Neuroradiology
            and in Head and Neck Imaging.