Bartlett, Lynsey Erin (CPSO#: 84473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 729-1324
Fax: (613) 729-5870
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Algonquin College Health Services
1385 Woodroffe Ave.
Room C141
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Canada
Phone: 613-727-4723 Ext. 7222
Fax: 613-727-3166
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lynsey Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bartlett ( CPSO# 84473 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 729-1324

Business Address:
1385 Woodroffe Avenue
c141
Ottawa ON  K2G 1V8
Phone Number: (613) 727-4723

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNSEY ERIN BARTLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008