Barton, Douglas Graham (CPSO#: 80877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County General
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON
Napanee ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Barton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barton ( CPSO# 80877 )

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS GRAHAM BARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006