Barton-Forbes, Michelle Ann (CPSO#: 81535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Feb 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Center
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58299
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barton-Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barton-Forbes ( CPSO# 81535 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Feb 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 21 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Michelle Ann Barton-Forbes may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Paediatric Infectious Diseases, University
                        of  Western  Ontario,  in which Dr. Barton-Forbes holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Barton-Forbes no longer holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Barton-Forbes'
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision about  Dr.  Barton-Forbes'
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on February 13, 2014 , and expires on June 30,
                  2019.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr. Barton-Forbes' academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.