Basahel, Nusaibah Samir O (CPSO#: 92057)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 29 Sep 2009
PEAP - Resident - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2010 to 29 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2011 to 29 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017