Basford, Tavis James (CPSO#: 81560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
347 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 754-2893
Fax: (519) 758-0182
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Burlington Pain Care
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 315-8802
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

4646 Dufferin St
North York ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 512-6407
Fax: (416) 512-6375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tavis J. Basford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Basford ( CPSO# 81560 )

Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
North York ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 512-6407

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 24
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 315-8802

Business Address:
347 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 754-2893

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAVIS JAMES BASFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006