Basi, Simran Singh (CPSO#: 95076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40606
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Simran Singh Basi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Basi ( CPSO# 95076 )

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMRAN SINGH BASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016