Basonbul, Faisal Abdullah S (CPSO#: 113454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Ave
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6153
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAISAL ABDULLAH S BASONBUL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BASONBUL is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BASONBUL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BASONBUL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BASONBUL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BASONBUL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BASONBUL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jul 2017 to 22 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2017 to 17 Oct 2017
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018