Basran, Sukhjeewan Kaur (CPSO#: 70051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Suite B307
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 986-4961
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sukhjeewan Kaur Basran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Basran ( CPSO# 70051 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Suite B307
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 986-4961

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKHJEEWAN KAUR BASRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2002