Bass, Catharine Joan (CPSO#: 82312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Warkworth Institution
County Road #23
PO Box 760
Attention: Medical Clinic
Campbellford ON  K0L 1K0
Phone: (705) 924-8040
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Bass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bass ( CPSO# 82312 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1M1
Phone Number: (705) 331-1552

Business Address:
Warkworth Institution
County Road #23
PO Box 760
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 924-8046

Business Address:
Western Parry Sound Health Clinic
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
75 Anne Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 745-4594

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Feb 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHARINE JOAN BASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 31 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2008