Bassi, Mahdi Mohammad Mahdi (CPSO#: 78685)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 20 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Nov 2003 to 20 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Nov 2004 to 20 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Nov 2005 to 20 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007