Bassoon-Zaltzman, Caroline (CPSO#: 60485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Steeles Health Centre
6257 Bathurst Street
2nd Floor
Willowdale ON  M2R 2A5
Phone: (416) 223-9791
Fax: (416) 223-9558
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaltzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bassoon-Zaltzman ( CPSO# 60485 )
Dr. J. Zaltzman ( CPSO# 60482 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Steeles Health Centre
2nd Floor
6257 Bathurst Street
Willowdale ON  M2R 2A5
Phone Number: (416) 223-9791

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 9-118
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE BASSOON-ZALTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSOON-ZALTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988