Bastedo, Timothy Paul (CPSO#: 93056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 10
1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil ON  L0S 1T0
Phone: (905) 468-3275
Fax: (905) 468-7960
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tim Bastedo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bastedo ( CPSO# 93056 )

Business Address:
1882 Niagara Stone Road
PO Box 10
Virgil ON  L0S 1T0
Phone Number: (905) 468-3275

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY PAUL BASTEDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTEDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012