Basu, Debesh Kumar (CPSO#: 75252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
New Brunswick
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBESH KUMAR BASU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2000 to 24 Jul 2000
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Effective December 19, 2017, Dr Basu completed the SCERP
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)