Batohi, Pravin (CPSO#: 75707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Natal, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 64219
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3270
Fax: (519) 663-3161
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pravin Batohi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Batohi ( CPSO# 75707 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3270

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRAVIN BATOHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATOHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 2000 to 09 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2001