Batool, Tahira (CPSO#: 89301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-7667
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Canada
Phone: (905) 852-9771 Ext. 5238
Fax: (905) 682-2005
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tahira Batool Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Batool ( CPSO# 89301 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 26 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHIRA BATOOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATOOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012