Batorowicz, Maria Jolanta (CPSO#: 54505)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Joseph's Health Care Dept of Anesthesia 268 Grosvenor St London, ON N6A 3N3
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018