Batten, Susan Diane (CPSO#: 96158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Clinic
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan D. Batten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Batten ( CPSO# 96158 )

Business Address:
Hanover Medical Clinic
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Business Address:
Hanover & District Hospital
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN DIANE BATTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013