Bauermeister, Senta Ute Frauke (CPSO#: 62230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R R 4
2205 Millar Road West
Spencerville ON  K0E 1X0
Phone: (613) 222-5300
Fax: (613) 658-5507
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville District Hospital
P O Bag 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0E 1X0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-4997
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SENTA UTE FRAUKE BAUERMEISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUERMEISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Oct 1995
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2018