Bauman, Glenn Stewart (CPSO#: 62159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Bauman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bauman ( CPSO# 62159 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN STEWART BAUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1991