Bauman, Shannon Marie (CPSO#: 79062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5K5
Phone: (705) 739-7667
Fax: (705) 739-7447
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Reg Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705)728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bauman and Ward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ward ( CPSO# 77616 )
Dr. S. Bauman ( CPSO# 79062 )

Business Address:
LL4 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 737-0363

Business Address:
RVH Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Barrie Endoscopy Clinic
5 Quarry Ridge Road
LL1
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1112

Business Address:
100 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5K5
Phone Number: (705) 739-7667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON MARIE BAUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005