Bautista, Alberto Montojo (CPSO#: 23860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of the Philippines, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1C9
Phone: (519) 255-9217
Fax: (519) 255-1039
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alberto Bautista Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bautista ( CPSO# 23860 )

Business Address:
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 255-9217

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 28, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alberto Montojo
            Bautista, in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Bautista has given
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                     DR. ALBERTO MONTOJO BAUTISTA
                                           ("Dr. Bautista")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Bautista, certificate of registration number 23860, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Bautista, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.





            (4)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bautista, undertake that I will cease to engage in the
                        practice of procedural sedation.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Bautista, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, any hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (6)   I, Dr. Bautista, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a
                  College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                  the provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Bautista's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Bautista must
                              not perform procedural sedation.
                  
                              Dr. Bautista shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
                              "Dr. Bautista must not perform procedural sedation. Further
                              information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                              Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Bautista, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Bautista, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Bautista, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of
                  my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Bautista, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Alberto Montojo Bautista to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 28, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Bautista’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Bautista must not perform procedural sedation.


Dr. Bautista shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Bautista must not perform procedural sedation. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.