Bawa, Jameet (CPSO#: 77905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Walk-In
& Family Physicians
Suite 106
100 Humber College
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 742-9449
Fax: (416) 742-6963
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
1575 Jane Street
North York ON  M9N 2R3
Canada
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
809 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Canada
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
1428 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 5B2
Canada
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
118 Mill Street
Unit 101
Georgetown ON  L7G 2C5
Canada
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Horizons - Opioid Treatment Service
279 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6T 4P9
Canada
Phone: 1-855-742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jameet Bawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bawa ( CPSO# 77905 )

Business Address:
106 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 742-9449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMEET BAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2004