Bawazeer, Mohammed Abdullah Salem (CPSO#: 96511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond street
Donnelly Wing 3-075a
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: 705-337-6111
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Rapid Access to Medical Specialists
21 Queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905-897-0788
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014