Bawazir, Mohammed Abdullah Salem (CPSO#: 95840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aden University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone: (905) 625-5600
Fax: (905) 625-5650
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 8
33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Canada
Phone: (519) 836 8558
Fax: (519) 822 0403
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Suite 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

99 Northfield Drive East
Unit 306
Waterloo ON  N2K 3P9
Canada
Phone: (519) 885-0222
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

13291 Yonge Street
Unit 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: (905) 773-3515
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Bawazir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bawazir ( CPSO# 95840 )

Business Address:
303-1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 625-5600

Business Address:
401-13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (907) 773-1599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 04 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABDULLAH SALEM BAWAZIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAWAZIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018