Baxter, Alan Dawson (CPSO#: 32262)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Oxford University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018