Baxter, Daniel (CPSO#: 82704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Baxter ( CPSO# 82704 )

Business Address:
Montford Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL BAXTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAXTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010