Bayat, Roain (CPSO#: 91378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System - Bramp
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roain Bayat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bayat ( CPSO# 91378 )

Business Address:
York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Richmond Hill ON  L4H 3X5
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROAIN BAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013