Bayer, Nessa Aviva (CPSO#: 73935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 489-3273
Fax: (416) 489-1510
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nessa Bayer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bayer ( CPSO# 73935 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NESSA AVIVA BAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003