Bayfield, Zak Alaistair (CPSO#: 80977)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: Bayat, Zak (used until: 02 Aug 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006