Bayliss, Colin Edward (CPSO#: 23492)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Date of Death: 24-Sep-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003