Bayne, Jennifer Laura (CPSO#: 75530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
sexual health center
179 Clarence St
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone: (613) 580-2424
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAURA BAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 31 Jul 2000 to 18 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002