Bazaid, Khalid Awad Saleh (CPSO#: 68315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2013

Expiry Date:  14 Oct 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 6137226521 Ext. 6413
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Bazaid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bazaid ( CPSO# 68315 )

Business Address:
The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2001 to 23 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Khalid Awadh Saleh Bazaid may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, Division of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, University
                        of Ottawa, in which Dr. Bazaid holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Bazaid  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Bazaid's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Bazaid's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 15, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 14, 2020.