Bazzarelli, Amy Kathleen (CPSO#: 93225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG wing, 6th floor, 6W275
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6583
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie BC  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434
County: 
Electoral District: 

201 Georgian Dr.
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

871 Thompson Dr. S.
Thompson MB  R8N 0C8
Canada
Phone: 204-677-2381
County: 
Electoral District: 

Mount Saint Joseph Hospital
3080 Prince Edward Street
Vancouver BC  V5T 3N4
Canada
Phone: 604-874-1141
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY KATHLEEN BAZZARELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZZARELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017