Beal, Timothy Lee (CPSO#: 94237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Rochester, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanatorium Road
Crombie Building Office 2 01
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: 519-858-2774
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Timothy Lee Beal may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry, only.