Beamish, Daniel Robert (CPSO#: 95850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT BEAMISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAMISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013