Bean, Sharon Helen (CPSO#: 91839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Bean ( CPSO# 89277 )
Dr. S. Bean ( CPSO# 91839 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Department of Anaesthesia
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 11 & 12
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 882-6566

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON HELEN BEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2010