Beaton, Jessica Jean (CPSO#: 90946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1260 Golf Links Road
Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1212
Fax: (807) 623-8832
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Beaton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Beaton ( CPSO# 90946 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Fort William Family Health Organization
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA JEAN BEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011