Beaubien, Eliot Rene (CPSO#: 76947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PRHC
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 8765147
Fax: (705) 8765178
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. E. Beaubien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Beaubien ( CPSO# 76947 )

Business Address:
815 High Street East
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 876-8737

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7735

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5147

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIOT RENE BEAUBIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUBIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001