Beauchesne, Luc Michel (CPSO#: 66228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7330
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Beauchesne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Beauchesne ( CPSO# 66228 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUC MICHEL BEAUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1993