Beaudet, Anne-Marie Louise (CPSO#: 83795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 56234
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AM Beaudet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beaudet ( CPSO# 83795 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE LOUISE BEAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2005 to 21 Nov 2005
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2006 to 08 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 17 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010