Beausang, Eamon Seosamh (CPSO#: 74598)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 06 Nov 2001
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2002