Beck, Gavin Reece (CPSO#: 94819)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 339 Windermere Road London, ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Feb 2011 to 30 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2014