Becker, Henry M (CPSO#: 90923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY M BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2018