Becker, Jennifer Christine (CPSO#: 89529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: 613-623-6719
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Becker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Becker ( CPSO# 89529 )

Business Address:
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-2048

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER CHRISTINE BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008