Becker, Lisa (CPSO#: 76074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3865
Fax: (416) 597-7107
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Becker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Becker ( CPSO# 76074 )

Business Address:
100-255 Consumers Road
Toronto ON  M2J 1R4
Phone Number: (416) 489-0711

Business Address:
Suite 5-131
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 25 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA BECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007