Beckett, Linda Ann (CPSO#: 77882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
916 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 531-6127
Fax: (613) 507-6127
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Beckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Beckett ( CPSO# 77882 )

Business Address:
Kingston Institute of Psychotherapy
and Neurofeedback
916 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 531-6127

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ANN BECKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005