Bedrossian, Diane Marie (CPSO#: 93200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downtown Toronto Doctors
Box 70
Suite 630
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (647) 427-6001
Fax: (416) 598-4659
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Toronto
Health Service
2nd Floor
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 971-2089
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ryerson University
Student Health
W181 West Kerr Hall
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-5070
Fax: (416) 979-5073
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Bedrossian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bedrossian ( CPSO# 93200 )

Business Address:
Downtown Toronto Doctors
Suite 630 Box 70
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (647) 427-6001

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Health Service
2nd Floor
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 978-8030

Business Address:
Ryerson University
Student Health
W181 West Kerr Hall
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Phone Number: (416) 979-5070

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE MARIE BEDROSSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDROSSIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012